Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC v. Barron et al

Plaintiff: Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC
Defendant: Matthew Barron and Timothy Kelton
Case Number: 4:2019cv01738
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC by Matthew Barron, filed. (Alaniz, Laura)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Kelton Deposition Testimony)(Clement, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to The Texas Citizens Participation Act by Matthew Barron, Timothy Kelton, filed. (Alaniz, Laura)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Clement, Stephen)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Conference held Denying #23 MOTION for Protective Order, Granting #24 MOTION for Protective Order. Each deposition of defendants Barron and Kelton will be limited to 3 hours. Counsel will follow the deposition procedures discussed on the record. Appearances: Ray Kutch. Appearances: Laura Alaniz, Cecily L Kaffer, Stephen H Clement. Ct Reporter: M. Malonoe. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Judge Sim Lake, filed. (aboyd, 4)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clement, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Protective Order by Matthew Barron, Timothy Kelton, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alaniz, Laura)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Matthew Barron, filed.(Alaniz, Laura)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE and Objection to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Matthew Barron, Timothy Kelton. (Alaniz, Laura)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy Kelton, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alaniz, Laura)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing re: #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zurik, Samuel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 65(b) Certification by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zurik, Samuel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Timothy Kelton served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Matthew Barron served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stephen H. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Cecily L. Kaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC identifying Ethos Energy GTS Holdings (US) LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Zurik, Samuel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Zurik, Samuel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Timothy Kelton. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Matthew Barron. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Stephen H. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/31/2019. (Zurik, Samuel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Cecily L. Kaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/31/2019. (Zurik, Samuel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Timothy Kelton, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Matthew Barron, filed.(Zurik, Samuel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22409846) filed by Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Zurik, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC v. Barron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethosenergy Light Turbines, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Zurik, III
Represented By: Stephen H Clement
Represented By: Cecily L Kaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Barron
Represented By: Laura Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kelton
Represented By: Laura Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?