The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company et al
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company Of The State Of Pennsylvania
Defendant: THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY and KILGORE INDUSTRIES, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv01763
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kilgore Industries, LP, filed.(Vanorny, Lindsey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kilgore Industries, LP, filed.(Vanorny, Lindsey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Vanorny on behalf of Kilgore Industries, LP, filed. (Vanorny, Lindsey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Tagtmeier on behalf of Kilgore Industries, LP, filed. (Tagtmeier, Ellen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company, filed.(Volf, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with jury demand by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company, filed.(Volf, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kilgore Industries, LP served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019, filed.(Schmidt, Laura)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, filed.(Schmidt, Laura)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilgore Industries, LP, The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Kilgore)(rguerrero, 4)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Schmidt, Laura)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILGORE INDUSTRIES, LP, THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22421001) filed by The Insurance Company Of The State Of Pennsylvania.(Schmidt, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Michael Volf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILGORE INDUSTRIES, LP
Represented By: Lindsey M Vanorny
Represented By: Ellen Gerson Tagtmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company Of The State Of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Laura D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?