Smarr v. The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Smarr
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon and The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series
Case Number: 4:2019cv01807
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/12/2019. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: James Quantrele Pope, Andrew D Thomas.(ERO:L. Purifoy), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: July/August 2020. ETT: 2 days. Bench trial. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 10/31/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/28/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/28/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Thomas, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Thomas, Andrew)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, filed.(Thomas, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-31413 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22450588) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Thomas, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smarr v. The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series 2004-12, c/o Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Andrew D Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The bank of New York as Trustee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., asset-backed certificates, series
Represented By: Andrew D Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smarr
Represented By: James Quantrele Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?