PIERCE et al v. MULBERRY STREET REAL ESTATE VENTURES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE KIPLING SCHOOL INC., JENNIFER PIERCE, HUW PIERCE, KIPLING STREET ACADEMY, INC., MULBERRY STREET REAL ESTATE VENTURES, LLC and GLENCOVER HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, MARTIN ORMON, ELIA GRIFFITH and TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 4:2019cv01814
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims against Elia Griffith are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; granting #26 Motion for Leave to File, Plaintiff's are to file their Amended Complaint on or before July 19, 2019. Plaintiff's shall respond to the personal jurisdiction and venue arguments raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (#'s 11 & 18) on or before July 19, 2019..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 17, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File, Unopposed MOTION Motion to Dismiss and for Leave to Amend( Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019.) by HUW PIERCE, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss and for Leave)(Joyce, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Original Petition (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Dunham Biles terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for C. Dunham Biles to Withdraw as Attorney by TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Biles, Charles)
June 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Deadlines re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss, #11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) ; Pltf's Responses due by 7/19/2019. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Deadlines by HUW PIERCE, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Unopposed Order Extending Responsive Deadlines)(Joyce, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed.(Dow, Sanford)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed.(Dow, Sanford)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Dow, Sanford)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Vanorny on behalf of ELIA GRIFFITH, filed. (Vanorny, Lindsey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal T. Dang on behalf of AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed. (Dow, Sanford)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanford L. Dow on behalf of AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed. (Dow, Sanford)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Dow, Sanford)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ELIA GRIFFITH, TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed.(Vanorny, Lindsey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected APPENDIX re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) by ELIA GRIFFITH, TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hernandez, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) by ELIA GRIFFITH, TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit of Philip Young), #3 Exhibit 1.A (Glencove Holdings, LLCs Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint in the Pitkin County action), #4 Exhibit 1.B (Objection of Glencove Holdings, LLC to Debtors Chapter 11 Plan), #5 Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of Elia Griffith), #6 Exhibit 2.A (Promissory Note), #7 Exhibit 2.B (Loan Agreement), #8 Exhibit 2.C (Aircraft Mortgage and Security Agreement), #9 Proposed Order)(Hernandez, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Hernandez on behalf of ELIA GRIFFITH, filed. (Hernandez, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HUW PIERCE, filed.(Joyce, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Original Petition ; Answer due for TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION 6/3/2019(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Original Petition by TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2019. (Vanorny, Lindsey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Vanorny on behalf of TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. (Vanorny, Lindsey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Hernandez on behalf of TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. (Hernandez, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Certificate of Service re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, #1 Notice of Removal, by TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. (Biles, Charles)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C. DUNHAM BILES on behalf of TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed. (Biles, Charles)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-27889 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22455383) filed by TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Index of State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Biles, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIERCE et al v. MULBERRY STREET REAL ESTATE VENTURES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE KIPLING SCHOOL INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER PIERCE
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUW PIERCE
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIPLING STREET ACADEMY, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULBERRY STREET REAL ESTATE VENTURES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENCOVER HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCRAFT FINANCE CORPORATION, LLC
Represented By: Crystal Thao Dang
Represented By: Sanford L Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN ORMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIA GRIFFITH
Represented By: David Modesto Hernandez
Represented By: Lindsey M Vanorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Charles Dunham Biles
Represented By: David Modesto Hernandez
Represented By: Lindsey M Vanorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?