Hoffman v. RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ari Hoffman
Defendant: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. and Eric S. Langan
Case Number: 4:2019cv01841
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 STIPULATION re: Defendants' Responsive Pleading (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: Defendants' Responsive Pleading by Eric S. Langan, RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Eric S. Langan, RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ari Hoffman, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22470272) filed by Ari Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kendall, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Marina Petrova Stefanova
Represented By: Jason S Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S. Langan
Represented By: Marina Petrova Stefanova
Represented By: Jason S Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Hoffman
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?