JIAO et al v. Xu et al
Plaintiff: Pengfei Zhou, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Xuanmei Zhou, Zhonghua Yu and XIONGEN JIAO
Defendant: Ningbo Xu, Dongtai Investment Group, LLC and LCL Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01848
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 Sealed ORDER., filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT Agreed proposed Amended and Extended TRO Order and Amended Joint Stipulation by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gargano, Brian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to LCL Company, LLC, Ningbo Xu. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Gargano, Brian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Xuanmei Zhou, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao, XIONGEN JIAO, Jiatong Yu, Pengfei Zhou. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, filed by XIONGEN JIAO, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4-1, #7 Exhibit 4-2, #8 Exhibit 4-3, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Setting as to #12 AMENDED #10 , #3 MOTIONAmended EMERGENCY MOTIONAmended MOTION for Temporary Restraining OrderAmended MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionAmended MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver. Parties notified. Temporary Injunction Hearing set for 6/14/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Sealed ORDER., filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 2, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT Agreed proposed TRO Order and Joint Stipulation by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. (Gargano, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to LCL Company, LLC, Ningbo Xu. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Gargano, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Xuanmei Zhou, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao, XIONGEN JIAO, Jiatong Yu, Pengfei Zhou. Related document: #9 Complaint,,,, filed by XIONGEN JIAO, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4-1, #7 Exhibit 4-2, #8 Exhibit 4-3, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Setting as to #12 AMENDED #10 , #3 MOTIONAmended EMERGENCY MOTIONAmended MOTION for Temporary Restraining OrderAmended MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionAmended MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 6/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to LCL Company, LLC, Ningbo Xu. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Setting as to #12 AMENDED #10 , #3 MOTIONAmended EMERGENCY MOTIONAmended MOTION for Temporary Restraining OrderAmended MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionAmended MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver, #5 MOTION to Expedite For Briefing and Hearing Schedule for TRO and TRI. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED #10 , #3 MOTION, Amended EMERGENCY MOTION, Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Amended MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver( Motion Docket Date 6/13/2019.) by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4-1, #9 Exhibit 4-2, #10 Exhibit 4-3, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Gargano, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected MOTION to Correct #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver ( Motion Docket Date 6/13/2019.), Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION, Corrected MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Corrected MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4-1, #9 Exhibit 4-2, #10 Exhibit 4-3, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22484759) filed by Xuanmei Zhou, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao, XIONGEN JIAO, Jiatong Yu, Pengfei Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4-1, #10 Exhibit 4-2, #11 Exhibit 4-3, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit 19, #27 Exhibit 20, #28 Exhibit 21, #29 Exhibit 22, #30 Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit 24, #32 Exhibit 25, #33 Exhibit 26, #34 Exhibit 27, #35 Exhibit 28, #36 Exhibit 29, #37 Exhibit 30, #38 Exhibit 31, #39 Exhibit 32, #40 Exhibit 33, #41 Exhibit 34, #42 Exhibit 35, #43 Exhibit 36, #44 Exhibit 37, #45 Exhibit 38, #46 Exhibit 39, #47 Exhibit 40, #48 Exhibit 41, #49 Exhibit 42, #50 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Keith P Ellison for the following reason: agreement between the judges. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (aboyd, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LCL Company, LLC, Ningbo Xu. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jdav, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Gargano, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite For Briefing and Hearing Schedule for TRO and TRI by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Gargano, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed.(Gargano, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019.), MOTION for Appointment of temporary receiver by XIONGEN JIAO, Qianju Jiao, Jiatong Yu, Zhonghua Yu, Pengfei Zhou, Xuanmei Zhou, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4-1, #9 Exhibit 4-2, #10 Exhibit 4-3, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22473609) filed by Xuanmei Zhou, Zhonghua Yu, Qianju Jiao, XIONGEN JIAO, Jiatong Yu, Pengfei Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4-1, #10 Exhibit 4-2, #11 Exhibit 4-3, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit 19, #27 Exhibit 20, #28 Exhibit 21, #29 Exhibit 22, #30 Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit 24, #32 Exhibit 25, #33 Exhibit 26, #34 Exhibit 27, #35 Exhibit 28, #36 Exhibit 29, #37 Exhibit 30, #38 Exhibit 31, #39 Exhibit 32, #40 Exhibit 33, #41 Exhibit 34, #42 Exhibit 35, #43 Exhibit 36, #44 Exhibit 37, #45 Exhibit 38, #46 Exhibit 39, #47 Exhibit 40, #48 Exhibit 41, #49 Exhibit 42, #50 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22473111) filed by Qianju Jiao, XIONGEN JIAO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4-1, #10 Exhibit 4-2, #11 Exhibit 4-3, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit 19, #27 Exhibit 20, #28 Exhibit 21, #29 Exhibit 22, #30 Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit 24, #32 Exhibit 25, #33 Exhibit 26, #34 Exhibit 27, #35 Exhibit 28, #36 Exhibit 29, #37 Exhibit 30, #38 Exhibit 31, #39 Exhibit 32, #40 Exhibit 33, #41 Exhibit 34, #42 Exhibit 35, #43 Exhibit 36, #44 Exhibit 37, #45 Exhibit 38, #46 Exhibit 39, #47 Exhibit 40, #48 Exhibit 41, #49 Exhibit 42, #50 Exhibit 43)(Gargano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JIAO et al v. Xu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongtai Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCL Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pengfei Zhou
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qianju Jiao
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiatong Yu
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuanmei Zhou
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhonghua Yu
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIONGEN JIAO
Represented By: Brian Michael Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?