Griffin v. Acosta et al

Plaintiff: Ms. Dawnyhetta Griffin
Defendant: J.E.R. Auto Transport LLC and Mr. Rusbel Reyes Acosta
Case Number: 4:2019cv01868
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rusbel Reyes Acosta, J.E.R. Auto Transport LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Joint Discovery Case Management Plan by Dawnyhetta Griffin, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berlanga, Warren)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rusbel Reyes Acosta, J.E.R. Auto Transport LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berlanga, Warren)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dawnyhetta Griffin, filed.(Cook, Kelly)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22488885) filed by Dawnyhetta Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Acosta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.R. Auto Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Rusbel Reyes Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Dawnyhetta Griffin
Represented By: Kelly Earl Cook
Represented By: Warren A. Berlanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?