Al-Pine v. Smith et al

Petitioner: Charles Al-Pine
Respondent: Jimmy Smith
Case Number: 4:2019cv01873
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Illinois Northern. Case Number 1:19-cv-03147; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED to the the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division the electronic record. (tt, )
May 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gel, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, for preliminary consideration pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the pending motions associated with docket entries #3 and #4 and to close the case on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice (tt, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioner Charles Al-Pine for attorney representation (lf, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Charles Al-Pine for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (lf, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Charles Al-Pine against Jimmy Smith (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 4/23/19) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Pine v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Al-Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?