First Coast Logistics, Inc. v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC

Plaintiff: First Coast Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01886
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01882, 4:19-cv-01885, 4:19-cv-01887, 4:19-cv-01890 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Russell)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 02:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd JDC, case number 2019-32772 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22495528) filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lewis, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Coast Logistics, Inc. v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Coast Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: John M Moon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Represented By: Russell Carter Lewis
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?