Holt v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Michael Holt
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill, US Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv01894
Filed: May 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill served on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Attorney General served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Attorney's Office served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney's Office, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Donaldson, Madison)
May 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22497164) filed by Michael Holt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holt
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?