Dougherty Jr. v. Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Dougherty Jr.
Defendant: Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01924
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling and Docket Control, filed.(Noble, Brooke)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed.(Noble, Brooke)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Noble on behalf of Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed. (Noble, Brooke)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/13/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.. (Mizell, Patrick)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: Deadline to Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Kenneth W. Dougherty Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Powers, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b). Responses due by 7/2/2019.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Kenneth W. Dougherty Jr., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(2) 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mizell, Patrick)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth W. Dougherty Jr., filed.(Powers, Matthew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd., filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 8/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th District Harris County, case number 2017-83317 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22506945) filed by Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(Mizell, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty Jr. v. Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hart Restoration & Race Preparation, Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Dougherty Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?