Larnelon Shipping Ltd. v. Lord Energy SA et al
Plaintiff: Larnelon Shipping Ltd.
Defendant: Lord Energy SA
Garnishee: Repsol Trading SA
Case Number: 4:2019cv01932
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Larnelon Shipping Ltd., filed.(Simms, J)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for J Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Appointment For Service of Writs of Maritime Garnishment. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lord Energy SA. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Larnelon Shipping Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Simms, J)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION For Appointment For Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Larnelon Shipping Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Larnelon Shipping Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Issuance of PMAG, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, #5 Proposed Order, #6 PMAG - Repsol)(Simms, J)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Larnelon Shipping Ltd., filed.(Simms, J)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Lord Energy SA, filed.(Simms, J)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lord Energy SA, Repsol Trading SA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22509850) filed by Larnelon Shipping Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simms, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larnelon Shipping Ltd. v. Lord Energy SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larnelon Shipping Ltd.
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Repsol Trading SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord Energy SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?