Riviana Foods Inc. v. Golden Star Trading, Inc.
Plaintiff: Riviana Foods Inc.
Defendant: Golden Star Trading, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01994
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Riviana Foods Inc., filed.(Renken, Brandon)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce B. Kemp on behalf of Golden Star Trading, Inc., filed. (Barr, Eugene)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Riviana Foods Inc. filed by Golden Star Trading, Inc..(Barr, Eugene)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Riviana Foods Inc. by Golden Star Trading, Inc., filed.(Barr, Eugene)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Riviana Foods Inc., filed.(Doineau, Emma)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Golden Star Trading, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Golden Star Trading, Inc., filed.(Doineau, Emma)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Star Trading, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22543829) filed by Riviana Foods Inc..(Doineau, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riviana Foods Inc. v. Golden Star Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riviana Foods Inc.
Represented By: Emma T. Doineau
Represented By: Janet Ellen Militello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Star Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?