Veggifruit Inc. v. Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmer's Market, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Veggifruit Inc.
Defendant: Robert Keith Hampton, Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmer's Market, LLC and Augustine Saldana, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02071
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that Veggiefruit, Inc., is no longer pursuing its claims against Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmers Market, LLC, Robert Keith Hampton; and Augustine Saldana, Jr., this case is dismissed with prejudice #15 . Case terminated on 6/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Veggifruit Inc., filed. (Draper, Tony)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Resetting Hearing. The hearing on the application for preliminary injunction reset for 6/18/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Resetting Hearing. The hearing on the application for preliminary injunction set June 13, 20I9 is RESET to 6/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Continuing Hearing granting #11 Joint EMERGENCY MOTION. On the joint motion of the parties, the June 13, 2019 hearing is canceled and will be reset.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Joint EMERGENCY MOTION by Veggifruit Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Emergency Motion for Continuance)(Draper, Tony)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Temporary Restraining ORDER terminating #4 . Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Robert Keith Hampton, Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmer's Market, LLC, Augustine Saldana, Jr. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Troy Bennett re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motions for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veggifruit Inc., filed.(Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Veggifruit Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2019. (Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veggifruit Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Atty Certification, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order - TRO Motion)(Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Veggifruit Inc., filed.(Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Draper, Tony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22568679) filed by Veggifruit Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Draper, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veggifruit Inc. v. Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmer's Market, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Keith Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junior's Produce at the Houston Farmer's Market, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustine Saldana, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veggifruit Inc.
Represented By: Tony L. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?