Bryant et al v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Bryant and Wesley Bryant, Jr
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02075
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 8/16/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller , filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Sanders, Jason)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust identifying U.S.Bancorp as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sanders, Jason)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, filed.(Sanders, Jason)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 155th District Court of Austin Co., case number 2019V-0064 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22570018) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Index of Docs, #3 Exhibit B-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit B-2 Plaintiffs' Petition, #5 Exhibit B-3 TRO & NOH, #6 Exhibit B-4 Citations, #7 Exhibit B-5 Bond, #8 Exhibit B-6 Defs' Answer, #9 Exhibit C List of All Counsel)(Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bryant
Represented By: Charley L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Bryant, Jr
Represented By: Charley L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?