Wallace v. Lazondo et al
Petitioner: Elijah William Wallace
Respondent: J. Lazondo, Kim Ogg and Nikita Horman
Case Number: 4:2019cv02093
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Elijah William Wallace, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION/APPLICATION to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Elijah William Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2019. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Appointment of Attorney by Elijah William Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2019. (jdav, 4)
July 11, 2019 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 19-20473 re: #13 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 3, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #13 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: not paid. , filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #13 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: not paid , filed. (dbenavides, 1)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #11 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: not paid, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
July 3, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #11 Notice of Appeal. The appeal filing fee has not been paid. (Dbenavides01)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #5 Memorandum and Order by Elijah William Wallace, filed.(dbenavides, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope) (dbenavides, 1).
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #6 Final Judgment by Elijah William Wallace, filed. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Proposed Order)(dbenavides, 1)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Elijah William Wallace, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Other EXHIBITS (re: Bank Statement) by Elijah William Wallace, filed.(mmarquez, 5)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Elijah William Wallace, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER on Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee as to Elija William Wallace. The Court AMENDS its Order of June 14, 2019, denying plaintiff leave and ORDERS that the #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) ***copy mailed to Tom Katz, Harris County Jail Inmate Trust Fund
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in this Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order of even date, this lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE....*** Case terminated on 6/24/19. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's claims against state district judge Nikita V. Harmon are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a viable claim for relief under section 1983. Plaintiffs' claims against Harris County District Attorney Kim Ogg are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as barred by prosecutorial immunity. Plaintiff's claims against HPD Officer J. Elizondo in his official capacity are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to raise a viable claim for relief. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. This lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to raise a viableclaim for relief under section 1983. Any and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This dismissal constitutes a "strike" for purposes of section 1915 (g). (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, within thirty days from date of this order, a certified copy of his current inmate trust report. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Elijah William Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (bmendoza, 5)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Nikita Horman, J. Lazondo, Kim Ogg (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Elijah William Wallace.(bmendoza, 5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Lazondo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Lazondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nikita Horman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elijah William Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?