Kelly v. Collier
Petitioner: Tommie Newton Kelly
Respondent: Brian Lee Collier
Case Number: 4:2019cv02100
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee. Any and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent necessary, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Case terminated on 7/10/2019 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, the Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee within 15 days of this order. Failure to comply timely with this order will result in dismissal of this lawsuit. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed. (nortiz, 5)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Tommie Newton Kelly.(nortiz, 5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Lee Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tommie Newton Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?