The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service
In Re: H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc.
Appellant: The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service
Appellee: Ford Steel, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02122
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE, granting #12 Agreed MOTION to Abate (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION to Abate by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 7/31/2019, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Andrew Hanen, Civil Action 4:19-cv-2122. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rick Kincheloe for Transcript of Status Conference on 7/8/19 before Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Kincheloe, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/8/2019. The parties gave the Court a status of the case. Appearances: Bruce J Ruzinsky, Julie Mitchell Koenig, Richard A. Kincheloe.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(rhawkins)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental Notice of Appeal filed by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Original document filed in bankruptcy case 17-35027.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. This case is hereby remanded to bankruptcy court. A status conference is set on 7/8/2019 at 10:00 a.m.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. MOTION HEARING held on 6/25/2019. The Court heard argument on #3 Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. The Court remands this case to the bankruptcy court to address the "subordination agreement" language. Order to follow. The Court further sets a status conference on this matter on 7/8/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Notice of Setting to follow. Appearances: Bruce J Ruzinsky, Julie Mitchell Koenig, Richard A. Kincheloe.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(rhawkins)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal , filed by Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company. (Ruzinsky, Bruce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc., Ford Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Koenig, Julie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On May 15, 2019 and June 10, 2019, The United States acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge The Honorable Andrew S. Hanen, Civil Action 4:19cv2122. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal filed May 15, 2019, #2 Amended Notice of Appeal filed June 10, 2019, #3 Bankruptcy docket sheet)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Mitchell Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Richard A. Kincheloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ford Steel, LLC
Represented By: Julie Mitchell Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?