Whittington v. Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC
Plaintiff: Jack Whittington
Defendant: Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02128
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC, filed.(Linberg, Pamela)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela B. Linberg on behalf of Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC, filed. (Linberg, Pamela)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC, filed.(Stukenberg, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jack Whittington, filed.(Liles, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Jack Whittington, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Jack Whittington, filed. (Liles, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22604737) filed by Jack Whittington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittington v. Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Whittington
Represented By: William Richard Liles
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC
Represented By: William R Stukenberg
Represented By: Pamela Banks Linberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?