Abbott v. American National Red Cross
Plaintiff: Caryn Abbott
Defendant: American National Red Cross
Case Number: 4:2019cv02131
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION by Caryn Abbott, filed.(Ruen, Jason)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American National Red Cross, filed.(Perry, Kristen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caryn Abbott, filed.(Ruen, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court, Harris County, case number 2019-31596-7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22605451) filed by American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Perry, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. American National Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryn Abbott
Represented By: Ryan Nicholas Berchelmann
Represented By: Jason John Ruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross
Represented By: Kristen Levon Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?