Rahming v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alvena B. Rahming
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor
Case Number: 4:2019cv02133
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, filed.(Sudbury, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, filed.(Sudbury, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Original Petition by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Proposed Order)(Sudbury, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Sudbury, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Agreement to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond and to Serve the Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sudbury, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alvena B. Rahming, filed.(Gordon, Joshua)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Alvena B. Rahming, filed.(Gordon, Joshua)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, filed.(Sudbury, Gregory)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-37810 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22605950) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahming v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvena B. Rahming
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Gregory Marshall Sudbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for EMC Mor
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Gregory Marshall Sudbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?