Varner v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dayna Varner
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02134
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that the parties want to dismiss this case, it is dismissed with prejudice #10 . Case terminated on 7/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Dayna Varner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE)(Lane, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Beverly, Lauren)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed.(Beverly, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 190th Judicial District Court, case number 201937730 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22607932) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit C3, #6 Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit C5, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beverly, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varner v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayna Varner
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren N Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?