Blaylock v. Cordova et al
Plaintiff: Nevert Blaylock
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Rodolfo Cordova
Case Number: 4:2019cv02168
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Maus, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Nevert Blaylock, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Return of Service on Allstate, #3 Exhibit Return of Service on Cordova, #4 Exhibit Allstate's Original Answer)(Fass, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th Harris County District Court, case number 2019-33933 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22619209) filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Index, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Docket, #3 Exhibit Ex. C State Court Docs., #4 Exhibit Ex. D State Court Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit Ex, F Counsel of Record)(Maus, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaylock v. Cordova et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Clifton Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevert Blaylock
Represented By: Richard Todd Fass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?