ADMIntermare v. Kamca Trading SA et al
Plaintiff: ADMINTERMARE, A Division of ADM International, SARL and ADMIntermare
Defendant: Glencore LTD. and Kamca Trading SA
Case Number: 4:2019cv02238
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Glencore LTD. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019, filed.(Hart, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ADMIntermare, filed.(Hart, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Re-Issued as to Glencore LTD.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Glencore LTD., filed.(Kimmitt, Gerard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kamca Trading SA, filed.(Kimmitt, Gerard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22658023) filed by ADMINTERMARE, A Division of ADM International, SARL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kimmitt, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADMIntermare v. Kamca Trading SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamca Trading SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADMINTERMARE, A Division of ADM International, SARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADMIntermare
Represented By: Christopher Roland Hart
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Kimmitt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?