Glover v. Luxottica USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Diane Glover
Defendant: Luxottica USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02253
Filed: June 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to #27 Answer to Complaint, /Response to Application to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by Diane Glover. (Brown, Nicholas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 RETURN of Service Executed as to Luxottica USA, LLC/Luxottica of America, Inc./Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corpo. c/o National Registered Agents on 7/3/19 re: Form USM-285, filed.(nortiz, 5)
July 24, 2019 Filing 33 RETURN of Service Executed as to Luxottica USA, LLC/Luxottica of America, Inc./Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corpo. c/o National Registered Agents on 7/3/19 re: Form USM-285, filed.(nortiz, 5) Modified on 7/24/2019 (nortiz, 5).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 18, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Response to Application to Vacate Arbitration Award under the Federal Arbitration Act by Diane Glover, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Exceed Standard Page Limit for Briefs.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luxottica USA, LLC identifying EssilorLuxottica as Corporate Parent, filed.(Edwards, Kelley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 SEALED EXHIBITS A re: #27 Answer to Complaint, by Luxottica USA, LLC, filed. (Edwards, Kelley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Luxottica USA, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Kelley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Standard Page Limit for Briefs by Luxottica USA, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Kelley)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Luxottica USA, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(sanderson, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Luxottica USA, LLC, filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 (760-859), #2 Exhibit 5 (860-899), #3 Exhibit 5 (900-954), #4 Exhibit 5 (955-1004), #5 Exhibit 5 (1005-1049)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 (096-190), #2 Exhibit 5 (191-285), #3 Exhibit 5 (286-360), #4 Exhibit 5 (361-440), #5 Exhibit 5 (441-520), #6 Exhibit 5 (521-600)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4B (DX120-DX169), #2 Exhibit 4B (DX170-DX249), #3 Exhibit 4B (DX250-DX329), #4 Exhibit 4B (DX330-DX377)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 19 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4A (DX035-DX069))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX1750-PX1789)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX1510-PX1549), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX1550-PX1589), #3 Exhibit 3B (PX1590-PX1629), #4 Exhibit 3B (PX1630-PX1669), #5 Exhibit 3B (PX1670-PX1709)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX1240-PX1264), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX1265-PX1289), #3 Exhibit 3B (PX1290-PX1314), #4 Exhibit 3B (PX1315-PX1339), #5 Exhibit 3B (PX1340-PX1364), #6 Exhibit 3B (PX1365-PX1389), #7 Exhibit 3B (PX1390-PX1429), #8 Exhibit 3B (PX1430-PX1469)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX1065-PX1089), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX1090-PX1114), #3 Exhibit 3B (PX1115-PX1139), #4 Exhibit 3B (PX1140-PX1189), #5 Exhibit 3B (PX1190-PX1214)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX895-PX919), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX920-PX969), #3 Exhibit 3B (PX970-PX1014), #4 Exhibit 3B (PX 1015-1039)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX759-PX783), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX784-PX808), #3 Exhibit 3B (PX809-PX833)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3B (PX684-PX708), #2 Exhibit 3B (PX709-PX733)) (Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 11 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A (PX468-PX544), #2 Exhibit 3A (PX545-PX601), #3 Exhibit 3A (PX602-PX658))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 10 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A (PX283-PX357), #2 Exhibit 3A (PX358-PX412))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 9 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A (PX245-PX257))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 8 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A (PX223-PX232))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 7 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A (PX160-PX197))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 6 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (HT740-HT750))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 5 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 4 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 3 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 2 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Diane Glover, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (HT670-HT679))(Brown, Nicholas)
June 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luxottica USA, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22661421) filed by Diane Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Luxottica USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica USA, LLC
Represented By: Kelley Riddle Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Glover
Represented By: Nicholas Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?