Dalamagkas v. University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston et al
Plaintiff: Kyriakos Dalamagkas
Defendant: University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Deana K. Moylan, Dr. Joel E. Frontera, University of Texas System Medical Foundation, Dr. Margaret Uthman and Board of Regents University of Texas System
Case Number: 4:2019cv02262
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION negotiations continued by phone on 8/20/2019. Appearances: Karla Evans Epperson.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION negotiations continued by phone on 8/16/2019. Appearances: Enrique M Varela, Michael Raphael Abrams.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION negotiations continued with plaintiff on 8/15/2019. Appearances: Brian Haralson Tew.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION negotiations continued by phone on 8/12/2019. Appearances: Brian Haralson Tew.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION negotiation continued by phone on 8/9/2019. Appearances: Enrique M Varela, Michael Raphael Abrams, Karla Evans Epperson.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 8/7/2019. Negotiations to be continued. Appearances: Enrique M Varela, Michael Raphael Abrams, Brian Haralson Tew, Karla Evans Epperson.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Pre Mediation TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/6/2019. Appearances: Enrique M Varela, Michael Raphael Abrams, Brian Haralson Tew, Karla Evans Epperson.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Board of Regents University of Texas System, Joel E. Frontera, Deana K. Moylan, University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Margaret Uthman. Attorney Michael R. Abrams added. Attorney Sean Flammer terminated, filed. (Abrams, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Abate. this case is abated for 60 days. All current settings, other than the August 7 mediation, are vacated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Abate by Board of Regents University of Texas System, Joel E. Frontera, Deana K. Moylan, University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Margaret Uthman, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flammer, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kyriakos Dalamagkas, filed.(Epperson, Karla)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER MEDIATION set for 8/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Pre Mediation Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Confidential Mediation Statements due by noon 7/31/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Board of Regents University of Texas System, Joel E. Frontera, Deana K. Moylan, University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Margaret Uthman, filed.(Flammer, Sean)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Flammer on behalf of Board of Regents University of Texas System, Joel E. Frontera, Deana K. Moylan, University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Margaret Uthman, filed. (Flammer, Sean)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Dena Palermo for Mediation. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re: Postponement of Hearing on TRO by Kyriakos Dalamagkas, filed.(Epperson, Karla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique M. Varela on behalf of Board of Regents University of Texas System, Joel E. Frontera, Deana K. Moylan, University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, Margaret Uthman, filed. (Varela, Enrique)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 6/28/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Setting as to #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kyriakos Dalamagkas, filed. (Epperson, Karla)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22667855) filed by Kyriakos Dalamagkas.(Epperson, Karla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalamagkas v. University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Sean Flammer
Represented By: Enrique M Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deana K. Moylan
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Sean Flammer
Represented By: Enrique M Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joel E. Frontera
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Sean Flammer
Represented By: Enrique M Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas System Medical Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Margaret Uthman
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Sean Flammer
Represented By: Enrique M Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents University of Texas System
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Sean Flammer
Represented By: Enrique M Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyriakos Dalamagkas
Represented By: Karla Evans Epperson
Represented By: Brian Haralson Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?