Kiggundu v. America's Wholesale Lender
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Kiggundu
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Intervenor Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB
Case Number: 4:2019cv02286
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Intervention. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and the Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB, may join this lawsuit #12 .(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Manning, Matt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Summary of Prior Lawsuits and Parties by America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Manning, Matt)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Management ORDER. The temporary restraint is vacated. The motion to remand is denied #6 . The lis pendens notice is void. By 8/2/2019, America's Wholesale Lender may counterclaim for judicial foreclosure. As soon as practicable, America's Wholesale must file a summary of Kiggundu's previous lawsuits. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 7/19/2019. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 8/5/2019. Appearances: Matt Manning. (Court Reporter: G. Dye) (ghassan, 4)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand, filed by America's Wholesale Lender. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Troiano, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Troiano, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Joseph E. Kiggundu, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2019. (nortiz, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Exhibit) (mmarquez, 5).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Manning, Matt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Danner, R)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-37420 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22679063) filed by America's Wholesale Lender. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Coversheet)(Troiano, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiggundu v. America's Wholesale Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Kiggundu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Matt D. Manning
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matt D. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB
Represented By: Matt D. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?