Engel v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Engel
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02289
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kevin Engel, filed.(Fitts, Bryant)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Dusty Nice and Jason Tang by Kevin Engel, filed.(Fitts, Bryant)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT, filed.(Fitts, Bryant)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law 2, Montgomery County, Texas, case number 19-05-07054 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22679850) filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Burke, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engel v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Engel
Represented By: Bryant Allen Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda Ruth Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?