Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc. v. AMSPEC, LLC
Plaintiff: Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: AMSPEC, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02302
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc., filed.(Martin, Dana)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AMSPEC, LLC, filed.(Cano, Rudy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by AMSPEC, LLC, filed.(Cano, Rudy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMSPEC, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Martin, Dana)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AMSPEC, LLC filed by Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc..(Martin, Dana)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMSPEC, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22684536) filed by Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc..(Martin, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc. v. AMSPEC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Trading & Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Keith Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMSPEC, LLC
Represented By: Rudy Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?