Simpson et al v. Osteostrong Franchising, LLC

Plaintiff: Charla Simpson, OS Regional Developers Colorado a/k/a OS Regional Developers Colorado, LLC, Sean Simpson, OS New Mexico, LLC and OS Regional Developers Colorado
Defendant: Osteostrong Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02334
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC identifying Blue Ocean International, L.L.C. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Steele, Howard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Steele, Howard)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Resetting Conference terminating #10 . Initial Conference reset for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steele, Howard)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jennifer Maged to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for David G. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jennifer Maged to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OS New Mexico, LLC, OS Regional Developers Colorado, Charla Simpson, Sean Simpson, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2019. (Reynolds, Chris)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for David G. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OS New Mexico, LLC, OS Regional Developers Colorado, Charla Simpson, Sean Simpson, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2019. (Reynolds, Chris)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Osteostrong Franchising, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019, filed.(Reynolds, Chris)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Osteostrong Franchising, LLC, filed.(Reynolds, Chris)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Osteostrong Franchising, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22698435) filed by Sean Simpson, OS Regional Developers Colorado a/k/a OS Regional Developers Colorado, LLC, OS New Mexico, LLC, Charla Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Osteostrong Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charla Simpson
Represented By: Chris Reynolds
Represented By: Jennifer Maged
Represented By: David G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OS Regional Developers Colorado a/k/a OS Regional Developers Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Chris Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Simpson
Represented By: Chris Reynolds
Represented By: Jennifer Maged
Represented By: David G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OS New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Chris Reynolds
Represented By: Jennifer Maged
Represented By: David G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OS Regional Developers Colorado
Represented By: Chris Reynolds
Represented By: Jennifer Maged
Represented By: David G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteostrong Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Howard L Steele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?