Mackey v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kyle Mackey
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02372
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Judgment, filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14)(Beverly, Lauren)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Judgment, filed by Kyle Mackey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. filed by Kyle Mackey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Beverly, Lauren)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Lis Pendens by Kyle Mackey, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kyle Mackey, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 02:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Kyle Mackey, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 281st Judicial District Court, case number 2019-44268 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22713653) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beverly, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackey v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Mackey
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren N Beverly
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?