United States of America v. Crosby Dredging, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Crosby Dredging, LLC (LA), Crosby Tugs, LLC and Crosby Dredging, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02390
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company, Crosby Dredging, LLC, Crosby Tugs, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(Magee, Todd)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22721059) filed by United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Magee, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crosby Dredging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Martin Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Todd Martin Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Dredging, LLC (LA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Tugs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Dredging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?