Ponder v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Sharon S Ponder and Stephen Bechtol
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation, R & D Properties Katy Mills, LLC, N/A, Ronald Hanson and Hanson Family Trust
Case Number: 4:2019cv02404
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 First DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Stephen Bechtol, filed.(Bechtol, Stephen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Designation of Attorney In Charge by Sharon S Ponder, filed. (Choi, Dong)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronald Hanson, Hanson Family Trust, filed.(Lanter, Frank)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sharon S Ponder.(DeVera, George)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 3-4 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 1/17/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 3/27/2020. Mediation due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/3/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/3/2020. Objections due by 8/21/2020 Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/14/2020. Docket Call set for 8/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H Miller(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Starbucks Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Corley, Gayla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sharon S Ponder, filed.(Choi, Dong)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by R & D Properties Katy Mills, LLC, NA, filed.(Lanter, Frank)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by R & D Properties Katy Mills, LLC, NA, filed.(Lanter, Frank)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 8/16/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT, filed.(Choi, Dong)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Starbucks Corporation, filed.(Corley, Gayla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT in Removed Action by Starbucks Corporation, filed.(Corley, Gayla)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County, case number 2019-38627 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22724748) filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Index, #2 Exhibit B_Harris Cty Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C_Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D_Process Req Sheet, #5 Exhibit E_1st Amd Petition, #6 Exhibit F_Request for Service, #7 Exhibit G_Ltr to Harris Clerk, #8 Exhibit H_Def's Answer, #9 Exhibit I_List of Counsel, #10 Exhibit J_Cert of Formation, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Corley, Gayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponder v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon S Ponder
Represented By: Dong Hee Choi
Represented By: Thomas Jude Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bechtol
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Bechtol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gayla Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & D Properties Katy Mills, LLC, N/A
Represented By: Frank David Lanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Hanson
Represented By: Frank David Lanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Family Trust
Represented By: Frank David Lanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?