Pastor v. Guardian Transition Inc. et al
Plaintiff: abner pastor
Defendant: Karam Industries, Kstrong LLC, Guardian Transition Inc., P.N. International and Sergio Pastor
Case Number: 4:2019cv02406
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Defendant KStrong, LLC's re: #17 MOTION to Strike #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed.(Beckelman, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Plaintiff's re: #10 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Beckelman, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Strike #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. filed by Abner Pastor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Birmingham, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Abner Pastor. (Birmingham, Joshua)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Karam Industries, Kstrong LLC, P.N. International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beckelman, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Joinder and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), filed by Kstrong LLC. (Walker, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and For Failure to State a Cause of Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), filed by Karam Industries, P.N. International. (Walker, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Kstrong LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walker, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Sergio Pastor. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sergio Pastor, filed.(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 25, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Guardian Transition Inc. et al Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies Summon forms are not attached by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sergio Pastor, filed.(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Abner Pastor, filed.(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Joinder and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , filed by Abner Pastor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and For Failure to State a Cause of Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Abner Pastor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Abner Pastor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Abner Pastor filed by Abner Pastor.(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Guardian Transition Inc., filed. (McFarland, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Karam Industries, Kstrong LLC, P.N. International, filed.(Beckelman, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Abner Pastor, filed.(Birmingham, Joshua)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John Raymond Salazar as to Abner Pastor re: #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (agould, 3)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 03:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Joinder and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Kstrong LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Beckelman, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and For Failure to State a Cause of Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Karam Industries, P.N. International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. B State Court Petition)(Beckelman, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st J.D. Court Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-06499 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22725415) filed by Karam Industries, Kstrong LLC, P.N. International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition, #3 Kstrong LLC Articles, #4 Affidavit, #5 Consents to Removal, #6 State Court File, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Index of Filings, #9 List of Counsel of Record, #10 Copy of State Court Notice of Removal)(Beckelman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pastor v. Guardian Transition Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: abner pastor
Represented By: Joshua Ray Birmingham
Represented By: John Raymond Salazar
Represented By: Charles Clayton Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karam Industries
Represented By: Michael S Beckelman
Represented By: Brian George Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kstrong LLC
Represented By: Michael S Beckelman
Represented By: Brian George Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Transition Inc.
Represented By: David A McFarland
Represented By: Julie M Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.N. International
Represented By: Michael S Beckelman
Represented By: Brian George Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?