Conner v. Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport
Plaintiff: cassie conner
Defendant: Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport, Edgar Sandoval and Raul Muro
Case Number: 4:2019cv02526
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by Raul Muro, Edgar Sandoval, filed. (Oppenheim, Roger)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cassie Conner, filed.(Ewart, Roy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Raul Muro, filed.(Oppenheim, Roger)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 INDEX OF MATTERS BEING FILED by Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oppenheim, Roger)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 LIST OF COUNSEL OF RECORD by Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport, filed.(Oppenheim, Roger) Modified on 7/26/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport, filed.(Oppenheim, Roger)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113th Harris County, case number 2019-41102 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22778417) filed by Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport.(Oppenheim, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Muro d/b/a Muro Auto Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Sandoval
Represented By: Roger D Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Muro
Represented By: Roger D Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: cassie conner
Represented By: Roy Keith Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?