Gomez v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jose Gomez
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02610
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:18-cv-12761; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Texas. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than June 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/4/2019.(mmv)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7286495) filed by Jose Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Jose Gomez(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gomez
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?