Mechelle v. USA Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Mechelle
Defendant: USA Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02679
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to USA Industries, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019, filed.(Verde, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22830048) filed by Wendy Mechelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verde, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mechelle v. USA Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mechelle
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong Verde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?