Harris v. NACE International
Plaintiff: Bridgette Harris
Defendant: NACE International
Case Number: 4:2019cv02685
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NACE International served on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Throckmorton, Connor)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bridgette Harris, filed.(Throckmorton, Connor)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NACE International. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to NACE International, filed.(Throckmorton, Connor)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:15 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:15 AM in by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NACE International (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22832417) filed by Bridgette Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Throckmorton, Connor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. NACE International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NACE International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Harris
Represented By: Connor Throckmorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?