Taylor Walker v. Skalka et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn J. Taylor Walker
Defendant: Johnathan Campbell, Carla Venzor, Ben Skalka and The Houston Housing Authority
Case Number: 4:2019cv02736
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johnathan Campbell, Ben Skalka, The Houston Housing Authority, Carla Venzor, filed.(Morris, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Johnathan Campbell, Ben Skalka, The Houston Housing Authority, Carla Venzor, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Houston, Jamie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Johnathan Campbell served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of FORM USM-285 (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) Executed as to The Houston Housing Authority served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of FORM USM-285 (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) Executed as to Ben Skalka served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of FORM USM-285 (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) Executed as to Carla Venzor served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
August 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons and USM 285 form delivered to USM for service., filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
July 25, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to All Defendants due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintff not present. Summons required for each defendant. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marilyn J. Taylor Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Proof Of Service, #6 Request to Waive Service of Summons, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Application to Proceed IFP Conditionally Granted on July 23 by Judge Lake.)(JenniferOlson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Walker v. Skalka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Campbell
Represented By: Richard A Morris
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Venzor
Represented By: Richard A Morris
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Skalka
Represented By: Richard A Morris
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Houston Housing Authority
Represented By: Richard A Morris
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn J. Taylor Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?