County of Kleberg v. CVS Health et al
Plaintiff: County of Kleberg
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Mallinckrodt PLC, Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Walmart Stores Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Amerisource Bergen Corporation, Actavis, Inc., Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS Health, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis Inc and Abbvie Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02815
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Transfer of case to Northern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 1:19op46159 and received on 12/31/2019., filed. (jdav, 4)
December 19, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
December 18, 2019 Filing 41 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4)
December 3, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Setting as to #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #16 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy, #7 MOTION to Remand. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - The Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., and Actavis LLC to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference, initially scheduled for November 15, 2019, and report are continued, and will be rescheduled following either (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL (Case No. 2804) or (2) entry of an order with this Court's ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, as necessary. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #23 Response in Opposition to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal, filed by Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Knoll Pharmaceutical Company to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkes, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ledwards, 4).
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Amerisource Bergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #24 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Lewis)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #16 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. (Hill, Jack)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time for Allergan Finance, LLC to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Allergan Finance, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 Other EXHIBITS re: #25 Notice (Other) by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Intent to File an Opposition Memorandum in Response to Kleberg County's "Opposition" to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition( Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019.), Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 Opposed RESPONSE to #18 Notice (Other) In Support of Removal, filed by County of Kleberg. (Snapka, Kathryn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to County of Kleberg served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Walmart Stores Inc served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Stores Inc, filed.(Scofield, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE (Supplemental) in Support of Removal by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, filed by County of Kleberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Dkt 50 Johnson Co. vs. Purdue)(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy( Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019.) by County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Proposed Order)(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Amerisource Bergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Stores Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Torian, Mark)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Torian, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by County of Kleberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Regarding Remands, #2 Exhibit Case Management Order One)(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Stay by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #7 MOTION to Remand by County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snapka, Kathryn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by County of Kleberg, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2019. (Snapka, Kathryn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mallinckrodt, PLC, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by County of Kleberg, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Torian, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22892792) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Kleberg v. CVS Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Represented By: John Laurens Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Kleberg
Represented By: Kira Talip Sanchez
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Represented By: Michael James Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?