Ibarra v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PEDRO IBARRA
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02898
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Scheduling and Docket Control Order)(Lucier, Georgia)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/4/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #13 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Taylor and Connell C. Hess in place of Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don K. Haycraft, Scott C. Seiler and Devin C. Reid.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. identifying BP p.l.c. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP America Production Company identifying BP p.l.c. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Taylor and Connell C. Hess in place of Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don K. Haycraft, Scott C. Seiler and Devin C. Reid by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Elwell, David F. Miller, Ashlee E. Dunham, & Anna J. McMullen on behalf of PEDRO IBARRA, filed. (Amaro, Randolph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PEDRO IBARRA, filed.(Amaro, Randolph)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:19-cv-01498; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. (NEF: Sect J)(caa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7434029) filed by Pedro Ibarra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Randolph James Amaro, Jr added to party Pedro Ibarra(pty:pla).(Amaro, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibarra v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas W Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas W Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO IBARRA
Represented By: Randolph James Amaro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?