Hill v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Hill
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services, successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, OCWEN Financial Corp. and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02909
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond by OCWEN Financial Corp., PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCWEN Financial Corp., PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services, successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22929364) filed by Samuel Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment)(Harris, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services, successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Financial Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Hogan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Hogan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Hill
Represented By: Keith Mandel Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?