Westside Ventures, Ltd. v. Houston Community College System et al
Plaintiff: Westside Ventures, Ltd.
Defendant: DWPW Grand Parkway, LLC, Houston Community College System and Houston Community College System District
Case Number: 4:2019cv02928
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by Houston Community College System District. (Brush, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed.(McFarland, Charles)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 First RESPONSE Plaintiff's Response to Houston Community College System's Rule 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Westside Ventures, Ltd.. (McFarland, Charles)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Houston Community College System District, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Brush, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by DWPW Grand Parkway, LLC, filed. (Prasatik, Sara)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County Court at Law No. 4, case number 1128913 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22937755) filed by Houston Community College System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 3)(Brush, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westside Ventures, Ltd. v. Houston Community College System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWPW Grand Parkway, LLC
Represented By: Sara McPherson Prasatik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Community College System
Represented By: Jonathan Griffin Brush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Community College System District
Represented By: Jonathan Griffin Brush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westside Ventures, Ltd.
Represented By: Charles Black McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?