Canal Indemnity Company v. Caljet, II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Canal Indemnity Company
Defendant: Phillips 66, Coastal Transport Co., Inc., National Interstate Insurance Company, Caljet, II, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Circle K Terminal, LLC, Caljet of America, LLC and Pro-Petroleum, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02945
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Spencer Mark Ritchie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Spencer Mark Ritchie to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin S. Gault Jr. on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. (Gault, Edwin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Canal Indemnity Company, filed.(Martin, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Interstate Insurance Company, filed.(Martin, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due to October 8, 2018. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER re: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief, filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/26/2019. (Pujol, Patrice)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Coastal Transport Co., Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Canal Indemnity Company by Phillips 66, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Bernick, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Phillips 66, filed.(Bernick, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Pro-Petroleum, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to National Interstate Insurance Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Phillips 66 served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Canal Indemnity Company, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Canal Indemnity Company identifying Canal Insurance Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Martin, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Circle K Terminal, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Caljet of America, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Caljet, II, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Caljet of America, LLC, Caljet, II, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Circle K Terminal, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company, Pro-Petroleum, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon, #5 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Caljet of America, LLC, Caljet, II, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Circle K Terminal, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company, Pro-Petroleum, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance Summons to Caljet of America, LLC, #2 Request for Issuance Summons to Chevron U.S.A., Inc., #3 Request for Issuance Summons to Circle K Terminal, LLC, #4 Request for Issuance Summons to National Interstate Insurance Company, #5 Request for Issuance Summons to Pro-Petroleum, Inc.)(Martin, Brian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coastal Transport Co., Inc., Phillips 66, Valero Marketing and Supply Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Summons Phillips 66, #2 Summons Valero) (rguerrero, 4). (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/13/2019) (rguerrero, 4).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Coastal Transport Co., Inc., Phillips 66, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance Summons to PHILLIPS 66, #2 Request for Issuance Summons to Valero Marketing and Supply)(Martin, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22944566) filed by Canal Indemnity Company.(Martin, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Indemnity Company v. Caljet, II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Represented By: Michael Halley Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Transport Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher W Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caljet, II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Patrice Pujol
Represented By: Edwin S Gault, Jr
Represented By: Spencer Mark Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Terminal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caljet of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Petroleum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Indemnity Company
Represented By: Brian Scott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?