DISH Network L.L.C. v. Easybox IPTV
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Defendant: DOES 1-5, individually and together d/b/a Easybox IPTV and Easybox IPTV
Case Number: 4:2019cv02994
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 9/26/2019 re: 10 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Request for International Judicial Assistance on the Taking of Evidence #3 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Request for International Judicial Assistance on the Taking of Evidence #3 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Request for International Judicial Assistance on the Taking of Evidence #3 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Discovery ORDER terminating #3 . Dish Network may subpoena and request information from the third parties ordered. By 11/4/2019, Dish Network may replead this case identifying the defendant as Easybox IPTV. When the other defendants are identified, they may be named. Internal review set for 11/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified. (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Issuance of Letters of Request by DISH Network L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Bradford Hammer, #3 Declaration of Gregory Duval, #4 Exhibits 1-8 to Duval Declaration, #5 Declaration of Stephen Ferguson, #6 Exhibits 1-15 to Ferguson Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., filed.(Ferguson, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-5, individually and together d/b/a Easybox IPTV (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22958857) filed by DISH Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. v. Easybox IPTV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-5, individually and together d/b/a Easybox IPTV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easybox IPTV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?