Perez v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Reina Perez
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation and Power Default Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03034
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF BRIEFING re: #5 MOTION for Judgment by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Curran, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Curran, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Curran, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Curran, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 61st Judicial District Court, case number 2019-53649 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22973839) filed by Power Default Services, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curran, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Perez
Represented By: Arden John Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?