Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP v. Molina
Plaintiff: Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP
Defendant: Edilerman Molina
Case Number: 4:2019cv03054
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Edilerman Molina 9/23/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Edilerman Molina, filed.(Stiner Toomer, Tamara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Edilerman Molina, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stiner Toomer, Tamara)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Edilerman Molina. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 09:15 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22991076) filed by Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huguenard, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP v. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edilerman Molina
Represented By: Tamara Danielle Stiner Toomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenda Channing Orleans Square LP
Represented By: Harris James Huguenard
Represented By: Bruce J Ruzinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?