Blue Fin Tankers, Inc. v. Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Plaintiff: Blue Fin Tankers, Inc.
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03055
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed.(Brar, Kuldeep)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed.(Brar, Kuldeep)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019, filed.(Power, James)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed.(Power, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22991223) filed by Blue Fin Tankers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Sales Confirmation, #2 Exhibit 2: BDN, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Power, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Fin Tankers, Inc. v. Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Fin Tankers, Inc.
Represented By: James H Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Kuldeep S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?