Dickerson v. University of Texas MD Anderson
Plaintiff: Amy Dickerson
Defendant: University of Texas MD Anderson
Case Number: 4:2019cv03086
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew S Hanen. Judge Gray H Miller no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Gray H Miller recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 10/31/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22999988) filed by Amy Dickerson.(Sprovach, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. University of Texas MD Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas MD Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Dickerson
Represented By: Ellen Sprovach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?