Mohammed v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammed
Defendant: Jessica Leigh Kromm, Janie Renee Williams, Timothy Paul McClure and ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv03087
Filed: August 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order re: #11 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan, filed.(Maus, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Maus, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ahmed Mohammed, filed.(Stogner, Brant)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ahmed Mohammed, filed.(Stogner, Brant)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Ahmed Mohammed, filed. (Stogner, Brant)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL entered. Because Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company has elected to be liable for Timothy Paul McClue, Janie Renee Williams, and Jessica Leigh Hall Kromm, they are DISMISSED. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Dismissal of Adjusters by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maus, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th Harris Count District Court, case number 2019-46877 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23000138) filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Index, #2 Exhibit B. Docket, #3 Exhibit C. State Court Docs, #4 Exhibit D. Notice to State Court, #5 Exhibit E. Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F. Counsel of Record)(Maus, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammed
Represented By: Angelina E Wike
Represented By: Brant Jeffrey Stogner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Leigh Kromm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Renee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Paul McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Clifton Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?